+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- No further action taken
On July 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2016 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service