+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 16, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5109
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2020 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in Virtual Hearing
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 10, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Revenue
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor