+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On September 26, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4637
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2016 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor