+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
On November 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 22, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday July 2, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 27, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 25, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Transportation
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor