+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 7, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday, July 6, 2016, pending concurrence
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday, June 22, 2016, pending concurrence
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/01/2016 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor