+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On July 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2016
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor