+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- No further action taken
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service