+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 01/28/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On December 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue