+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On October 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On October 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third, amended, and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On December 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On December 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On November 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor