+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 26, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On October 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Election Laws
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor