+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 30, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On October 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On October 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws