+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2019
On October 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 10, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted
On October 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On October 10, 2019 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On October 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading and passed to be engrossed.
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed), rules suspended and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On September 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor