+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 27, 2020 in the House:
- Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4673
- Read third
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
On September 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor