+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On October 13, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5007
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2020 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On December 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor