+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2020
On April 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On April 17, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted
On April 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On December 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On December 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On November 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On November 7, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On August 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor