+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
On September 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
On July 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor