+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On August 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2019
On August 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On August 12, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted
On August 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On July 23, 2019 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On July 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor