+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On August 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2019
On August 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On August 8, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted
On August 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service