+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2022
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On July 21, 2022 in the House:
- Enacted
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On December 13, 2021 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On December 9, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government