+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On October 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 77 of the Acts of 2021
On October 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 20, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On October 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On August 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On July 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service