+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On August 19, 2019 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means
On July 18, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 07/16/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government