+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2020
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On November 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On August 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On August 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor