+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 437
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Housing
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor