+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Labor and Workforce Development
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor