+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On November 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 95 of the Acts of 2021
On November 24, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On November 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On November 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On October 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On October 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Returned from the Secretary of State
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State