+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence
On September 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor