+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 23, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5209
On November 25, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On November 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence
- Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 23, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
On March 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence
On July 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor