+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 1, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5160
On August 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
On July 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 18, 2019 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Financial Services
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor