+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On December 7, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5135
On July 7, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On July 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Saturday, August 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday March 30, 2020, pending concurrence
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Elder Affairs
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor