+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5127
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 07/16/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government