+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 22, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence
On July 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
+ − Sponsors (103)
Type:
Primary Sponsor