+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Read third
- Amended by substitution of a bill, H3947
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2021 from 12:00 PM-12:01 PM in Written Testimony Only
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government