+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On October 19, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On October 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence
- Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- House concurred
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor