+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4457
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor