+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 4, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5090
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
On October 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor