+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On December 23, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Housing
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor