+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On August 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy