+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On October 26, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5043
On September 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On September 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure