+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 31, 2022 in the House:
- Rules supended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 12, 2022 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 2, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 16, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On December 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On December 23, 2021 in the House:
- Reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules