+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- Accompanied by H1841
On July 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 08/03/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary