+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 26, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5043
On September 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor