+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 4, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5031
On September 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On August 29, 2019 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Revenue
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities