+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- New draft substituted, see H4399
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4399
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On November 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in B-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act to Regulate Appraisal Management
Companies
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor