+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday May 12, 2022, pending concurrence
On December 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor