+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 2, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4826
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday May 27, 2022, pending concurrence
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday May 12, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday March 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor