+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222
On July 30, 2013 in the House:
- New draft substituted, see H3569
- Read second
On July 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
- Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
- Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H3569
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on House Ways and Means
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor