+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 6, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2013 from 01:30 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Financial Services