+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on House Rules
On November 26, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On October 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor