+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On September 26, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5284
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence
On October 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Election Laws