+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5126
On November 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On October 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On October 10, 2019 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Transportation
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor